THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:14:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1994
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2022 to 31 Mar 2023
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neurology
24 Jun 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Apr 2021 to 23 Jun 2021
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neurology
01 Sep 2015 to 17 Nov 2015
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Apr 2023 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 31 Mar 2023
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurology
DATE: 24 Jun 2021 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Apr 2021 to 23 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neurology
DATE: 01 Sep 2015 to 17 Nov 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015