THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:45:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 126
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V7
Phone: 2267047246
Fax: 2267042273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl (CPSO#: 107868 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2267827246
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2462 Howard Avenue
Suite 126
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V7
Phone: 2267047246
Fax: 2267042273

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl (CPSO#: 107868 ) Dr. C. Blue (CPSO#: 94354 )
Business Address: 2464 Howard Ave
Windsor ON N8X 3V6
2267827246
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4411

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Feb 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 15 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JEFFREY TOBIAS NIGL may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine and adult chronic pain management.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JEFFREY TOBIAS NIGL may practise medicine independently in emergency medicine and adult chronic pain management.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2015