THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:14:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Confederation Medical Clinic
3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 306-7885
Fax: 905-306-7895

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Confederation Medical Clinic
3050 Confederation Pkwy
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 306-7885
Fax: 905-306-7895

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGARET ATTIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Newcastle University Faculty of Medical Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015