THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:30:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058811010
Fax: 7058811080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Ducas Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ducas (CPSO#: 107968 )
Business Address: 15 Maple Avenue
unit 1614
Barrie Ontario L4N 2N6
2042294757

Corporation Name: DR. ANNE DUCAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jul 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058811010
Fax: 7058811080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne Ducas Medical Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ducas (CPSO#: 107968 )
Business Address: 15 Maple Avenue
unit 1614
Barrie Ontario L4N 2N6
2042294757

Corporation Name: DR. ANNE DUCAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Jul 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ATHENA DUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ATHENA DUCAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2015