THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:27:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Proxima Health Center
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.WIJEKOON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALA
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Matheson Blvd W
Proxima Health Center
Mississauga ON L5R 0H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.WIJEKOON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sachith Chathuranga Wijekoon may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Sachith Chathuranga Wijekoon may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2015