THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:29:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
900 Greenbank Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2J 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 825 8476
Fax: 613 825 9045
Address: 2179 Elmira Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Transitional Care Unit
Ottawa ON K2C 3S1
Phone: 613 737 8899
Extension: 19511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
900 Greenbank Rd
Ottawa Ontario K2J 1S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 825 8476
Fax: 613 825 9045
Address: 2179 Elmira Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Transitional Care Unit
Ottawa ON K2C 3S1
Phone: 613 737 8899
Extension: 19511
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EISHA MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EISHA MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015