THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:18:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Bronte street south
Unit no. 2
Milton Ontario L9T 9B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-812-0194
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3061 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 0W3
Phone: 289-812-0186
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Radiation Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Radiation Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadia Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Bronte street south
Unit no. 2
Milton Ontario L9T 9B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-812-0194
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3061 Walker's Line
Burlington ON L7M 0W3
Phone: 289-812-0186
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Apr 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 09 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Medical Radiation Technology Canada
PROFESSION: Medical Radiation Technology
JURISDICTION: Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sadia Rashid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADIA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SADIA RASHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Apr 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015