THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:12:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135626262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135626262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA ISABELLA SOBALA DROZDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBALA DROZDOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA ISABELLA SOBALA DROZDOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOBALA DROZDOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015