THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:04:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-80 Elm St
Northwood Medical Clinic
Sudbury ON P3C 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705) 806-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-80 Elm St
Northwood Medical Clinic
Sudbury ON P3C 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705) 806-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 11 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALEIGH TERESA BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALEIGH TERESA BRIGGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIGGS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015