THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:39:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Allaura Medical Center
11 - 2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 713-1717
Fax: (905) 751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FILIPINO, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Allaura Medical Center
11 - 2 Allaura Blvd
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 713-1717
Fax: (905) 751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE KRISTINE EPISCOPE CASTILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTILLO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOYCE KRISTINE EPISCOPE CASTILLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTILLO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2015