THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Care of the Elderly
Élisabeth Bruyère Hospital
Bruyère Continuing Care
43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Care of the Elderly
Élisabeth Bruyère Hospital
Bruyère Continuing Care
43 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHA SHAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015