THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:22:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8250 Lawson Road
Milton Ontario L9T 5C6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: +18888913459
Fax: +12028582397

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.R. Abd Halim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8250 Lawson Road
Milton Ontario L9T 5C6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: +18888913459
Fax: +12028582397

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.R. Abd Halim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SITI RASYIDAH ABD HALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABD HALIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SITI RASYIDAH ABD HALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABD HALIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2015