THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:33:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Nov 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Nov 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2011
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Psychiatry
28 May 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
University of Ottawa
EL - Psychiatry
01 Nov 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: EL - Psychiatry
DATE: 28 May 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: EL - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Nov 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 May 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2015