THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 10
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054683275
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-224 Garrison Rd
Fort Erie
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1M7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Walk-In Clinic
7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls, Ontario
L2G 6S5
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 6S5
Phone: 289-477-6011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Morrison St Walk In Clinic
7453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls, Ontario
L2E 7H1
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Phone: 2892961933
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Gelnridge Walk-In Clinic
209 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines
Ontario L2T 3J6
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
Phone: 289-362-5333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 10
1882 Niagara Stone Road
Virgil Ontario L0S 1T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054683275
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 6-224 Garrison Rd
Fort Erie
Fort Erie Ontario L2A 1M7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Niagara Walk-In Clinic
7481 Oakwood Drive
Niagara Falls, Ontario
L2G 6S5
Niagara Falls Ontario L2G 6S5
Phone: 289-477-6011
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Morrison St Walk In Clinic
7453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls, Ontario
L2E 7H1
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 7H1
Phone: 2892961933
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Gelnridge Walk-In Clinic
209 Glenridge Ave
St. Catharines
Ontario L2T 3J6
St. Catharines Ontario L2T 3J6
Phone: 289-362-5333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ronan Daniel O'Leary may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ronan Daniel O'Leary may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2015