THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:59:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Innovation Medical Clinic
40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 851-2444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vaughan Innovation Medical Clinic
40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 851-2444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Nov 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Feb 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 22 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rana Botlani Esfahani may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rana Botlani Esfahani may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2015