THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:42:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lucknow, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 LensAvenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52524
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 112-11811 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Phone: (519) 979-2255
Fax: (519) 979-3782
Address: 108-2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 258-7248
Fax: (519) 258-9408
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577
Extension: 52448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 254-7553
Fax: (519) 254-6054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Lucknow, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 LensAvenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52524
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 112-11811 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh Ontario N8N 4M7
Phone: (519) 979-2255
Fax: (519) 979-3782
Address: 108-2425 Tecumseh Rd E
Windsor Ontario N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 258-7248
Fax: (519) 258-9408
Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: 5192545577
Extension: 52448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 160-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor Ontario N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 254-7553
Fax: (519) 254-6054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 12 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 24 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Roli Rani Agrawal may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Roli Rani Agrawal may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lucknow, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2015