THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:47:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Khafaji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Khafaji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 May 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Sep 2022
Summary of Decision:

On September 21, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Al-Khafaji sexually abused Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with Patient A, including sexual intercourse. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Al-Khafaji engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by violating appropriate doctor-patient boundaries, including going on trips with Patient A and renting a condominium for Patient A.
 
The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Al-Khafaji attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Al-Khafaji’s certificate of registration immediately;
3. Dr. Al-Khafaji reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the order in the amount of $16,060;
4. Dr. Al-Khafaji pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 21, 2022.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-09-21

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 21 Sep 2022
Summary of Decision:

On September 21, 2022, the Tribunal found that Dr. Al-Khafaji sexually abused Patient A and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by engaging in a sexual relationship with Patient A, including sexual intercourse. The Tribunal also found that Dr. Al-Khafaji engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by violating appropriate doctor-patient boundaries, including going on trips with Patient A and renting a condominium for Patient A.
 
The Tribunal ordered that:
 
1. Dr. Al-Khafaji attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
2. the Registrar revoke Dr. Al-Khafaji’s certificate of registration immediately;
3. Dr. Al-Khafaji reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under s. 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within 30 days of the order in the amount of $16,060;
4. Dr. Al-Khafaji pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by October 21, 2022.
 
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].

Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2022-09-21

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2022
Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 21 Sep 2022
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 10 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Revoked: Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Revocation by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2015