THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:20:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 302-2020 Richmond Rd
Victoria BC V8R 6R5
Date Received: 23 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgical Oncology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 302-2020 Richmond Rd
Victoria BC V8R 6R5
Date Received: 23 Jul 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2016