THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:04:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud Bin Abdulaziz University, 2015
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
11 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2019 to 10 Jul 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
11 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2018 to 10 Jul 2018
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
11 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
13 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
PEAP - R - Neuropathology
01 Jan 2016 to 12 Feb 2016
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
DATE: 11 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Jul 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
DATE: 11 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
DATE: 11 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
DATE: 13 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Neuropathology
DATE: 01 Jan 2016 to 12 Feb 2016
UNIVERSITY: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016