THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-4790 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-356-4222
Fax: 905-356-5676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. RAMANAUSKAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Oct 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-4790 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON L2E 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-356-4222
Fax: 905-356-5676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. J. RAMANAUSKAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Oct 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 12 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Justin Ramanauskas may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Justin Ramanauskas may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2015