THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:03:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103 - 99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: (613) 591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical reocrds may contact Dr.Woodhouse at:
103 - 99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata ON K2L 3C8

or

Tel: 613-592-1448
Date Received: 08 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 103 - 99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata Ontario K2L 3C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 592-1448
Fax: (613) 591-3778

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical reocrds may contact Dr.Woodhouse at:
103 - 99 Kakulu Rd
Kanata ON K2L 3C8

or

Tel: 613-592-1448
Date Received: 08 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOAN WOODHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODHOUSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMANDA JOAN WOODHOUSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODHOUSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 Sep 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 08 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2016