THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 03:25:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab - University Centre
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-122
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4200
Fax: (416) 597-7066
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 475
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
14 St Matthews Road
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehab - Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Rehab - University Centre
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-122
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Extension: 4200
Fax: (416) 597-7066
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 475
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
14 St Matthews Road
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Rehab - Bickle Centre
130 Dunn Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 2R7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto General Hospital
Division of Geriatric Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 10 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care Toronto
University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network E.W. Bickle Centre for Complex Continuing Care
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Jan 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 10 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Asenath Steiman may practise medicine independently in geriatric medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Asenath Steiman may practise medicine independently in geriatric medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016