THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 07:00:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2016