THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 21:59:13 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad De Guadalajara, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 377-7768
Fax: (905) 372-4243

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad De Guadalajara, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 377-7768
Fax: (905) 372-4243

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 17 Feb 2016
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Peter Christopher Barnett may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Peter Christopher Barnett may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad De Guadalajara, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 Aug 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2016