THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:56:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Atria III 2225 Sheppard Ave. east
Suite 901
C/O Tripod Medical Inc.
Toronto Ontario M2J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-3420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Atria III 2225 Sheppard Ave. east
Suite 901
C/O Tripod Medical Inc.
Toronto Ontario M2J 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 201-3420
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK MAWUPE DZINEKU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZINEKU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FREDERICK MAWUPE DZINEKU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZINEKU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2016