THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:59:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rajiv Gandhi Univ of Health Sciences, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
15 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
01 Mar 2016 to 14 Apr 2016
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 15 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
DATE: 01 Mar 2016 to 14 Apr 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2016