THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:54:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1107 Pandora Avenue
Victoria British Columbia V8V 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2505193870
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1107 Pandora Avenue
Victoria British Columbia V8V 3P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2505193870
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN MARY PRENDIVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRENDIVILLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN MARY PRENDIVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRENDIVILLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2016