THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:59:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of General
Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Lecca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: DR. JAMES ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Division of General
Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K0T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Patricia Lecca Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Mar 2024

Corporation Name: DR. JAMES ZHANG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA LECCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LECCA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA LECCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LECCA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2016