THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:51:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: ACHD Clinic, Peter Munk Building, 5th Floor
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON, M5G 2C4
Date Received: 20 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: ACHD Clinic, Peter Munk Building, 5th Floor
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto, ON, M5G 2C4
Date Received: 20 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 21 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Feb 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2016