THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Science Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
300 Prince Philip Drive
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097777090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Science Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
300 Prince Philip Drive
St. John's Newfoundland and Labrador A1B 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7097777090
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOONG WAH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOONG WAH LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 May 2016