THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:58:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-329-1865
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-329-1865
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Pathology
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER BRUCE MALCOLM HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TYLER BRUCE MALCOLM HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2016