THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:46:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Santa Cruz (UES, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Santa Cruz (UES, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLIVIA HAUN DE OLIVEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUN DE OLIVEIRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLIVIA HAUN DE OLIVEIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAUN DE OLIVEIRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Santa Cruz (UES, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2016