THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:05:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Devision of cardiology
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
Devision of cardiology
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZAD DARABI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DARABI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DARABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DARABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DARABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DARABI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DARABI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARZAD DARABI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. DARABI is enrolled at University of Toronto;
(2) Dr. DARABI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. DARABI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;
(3) Dr. DARABI shall not charge a fee for medical services;
(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. DARABI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. DARABI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).
NOTE: This certificate expires on 30 June, 2025.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Toronto
AVP - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
15 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Cardiology
01 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2025 to 30 Jun 2026
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
DATE: 23 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: AVP - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 22 Sep 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Cardiology
DATE: 15 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Cardiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016