THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:48:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology / Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology / Oncology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Sep 2020
31 Aug 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 01 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Yogi Raj Chopra may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Hematology/Oncology, University of Toronto,
in which Dr. Chopra holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Chopra no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Chopra's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Chopra's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2020. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2027.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Yogi Raj Chopra may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Hematology/Oncology, University of Toronto,
in which Dr. Chopra holds an academic appointment at the rank of
Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Chopra no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Chopra's clinical
performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Chopra's certificate
of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
report.


Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2020. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on August 31, 2027.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bharati Vidyapeeth Deemed University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Aug 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016