THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:45:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Effective: 20 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID ABDULLAH N ALODAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALODAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID ABDULLAH N ALODAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALODAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 May 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 2016