THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:29:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Center
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213535
Fax: 9057213552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Center
3rd Floor
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057213535
Fax: 9057213552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA ANNIE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARA ANNIE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016