THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:34:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Ave
Sport Medicine Clinic at Ottawa University
Minto Sport Complex
2nd floor
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-416-8902
Fax: 613-701-8877
Address: 4289 Innes Road
East Ottawa Kids Care Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
Phone: 613-566-4470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 535 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0V1
Phone: 613-746-5350
Fax: 613-746-5340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada
Law Canada - Quebec
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada

PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 801 King Edward Ave
Sport Medicine Clinic at Ottawa University
Minto Sport Complex
2nd floor
Ottawa ON K1N 6N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-416-8902
Fax: 613-701-8877
Address: 4289 Innes Road
East Ottawa Kids Care Clinic
Ottawa Ontario K1E 0A8
Phone: 613-566-4470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 535 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0V1
Phone: 613-746-5350
Fax: 613-746-5340

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Law Canada
Law Canada - Quebec
PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada

PROFESSION: Law
JURISDICTION: Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULINE LOUISE LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULINE LOUISE LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016