THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:59:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern ON
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Dec 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 12 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARIA DEL CARMEN LIY WONG may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARIA DEL CARMEN LIY WONG may practise medicine independently in pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Nuevo Leon, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Dec 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 05 Nov 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 05 Nov 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016