THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 04:04:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: 705-789-2311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kenya

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDY BUZIKIEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUZIKIEVICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDY BUZIKIEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUZIKIEVICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016