THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:03:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-533-2538
Fax: 613-533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.H. Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilkinson (CPSO#: 109043 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 76 Stuart St
Etherington Hall, Room 1018
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-533-2538
Fax: 613-533-6654

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Mar 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 11 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.H. Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilkinson (CPSO#: 109043 )
Business Address: 76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMELIA HAMILTON WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMELIA HAMILTON WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016