THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:57:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Hospital
General Surgery and Critical Care
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 519 777 0941
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
General Surgery and Critical Care
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 777 0941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Hospital
General Surgery and Critical Care
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 519 777 0941
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 115 Delhi St
Guelph General Hospital
General Surgery and Critical Care
Guelph ON N1E 4J4
Phone: 519 777 0941
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER AMANDA KOICHOPOLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOICHOPOLOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER AMANDA KOICHOPOLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOICHOPOLOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016