THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department,
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus,
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department,
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Metropolitan Campus,
1995 Lens Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3129 Marentette Ave
Occupational Health Clinics for Ontario Workers
Unit 1
Windsor ON N8X 4G1
Phone: 5199734800
Fax: 5199731906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department,
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus,
1030 Ouellette Ave.
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Department,
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Metropolitan Campus,
1995 Lens Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3129 Marentette Ave
Occupational Health Clinics for Ontario Workers
Unit 1
Windsor ON N8X 4G1
Phone: 5199734800
Fax: 5199731906

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN PATRICIA ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLYN PATRICIA ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016