THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:07:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 340 4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 340 4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 11 Sep 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ELIZABETH LITKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ELIZABETH LITKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016