THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:46:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2016
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
29 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2021 to 28 Jul 2021
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2022 to 19 Dec 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
DATE: 29 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 28 Jul 2021
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016