THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magenta Health
1874 Queen St. E.
Toronto Ontario M4L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474798410
Fax: 4373179765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magenta Health
1874 Queen St. E.
Toronto Ontario M4L 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6474798410
Fax: 4373179765

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH MITSUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITSUKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ELIZABETH MITSUKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MITSUKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016