THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:31:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Sheppard Ave E
Unit # 107
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-777-0004
Fax: 416-826-0009
Address: 1620 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 4B4
Phone: 6476168300
Fax: 6477484300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Jul 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1100 Sheppard Ave E
Unit # 107
North York ON M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-777-0004
Fax: 416-826-0009
Address: 1620 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON M9V 4B4
Phone: 6476168300
Fax: 6477484300

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Jul 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HART ADAM GOLDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HART ADAM GOLDHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016