THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Medical Centre
20-22 - 360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-0360
Fax: (905) 881-3601
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: University of Dublin, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 360 Medical Centre
20-22 - 360 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-0360
Fax: (905) 881-3601
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (416) 323-6534

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLEXANDRA KOSHKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSHKINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLEXANDRA KOSHKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSHKINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016