THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:23:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel P. Schoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg Ontario K9A 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-372-6811
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 28 Oct 2024
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 28 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Northumberland Hills Hospital Cobourg
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
HOSPITAL: Northumberland Hills Hospital
LOCATION: Cobourg

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel P. Schoon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL PATRICIA SCHOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL PATRICIA SCHOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHOON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016