THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:08:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lazo
21 CF H Svcs Comox
Building 309 Heritage Boulevard
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Comox Valley British Columbia V0R 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250-339-8211
Extension: 8465
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Family Health Team
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Phone: 8072293243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lazo
21 CF H Svcs Comox
Building 309 Heritage Boulevard
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Comox Valley British Columbia V0R 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 250-339-8211
Extension: 8465
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 22 Peninsula Road
Marathon Family Health Team
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
Phone: 8072293243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North of Superior Healthcare Group Marathon
HOSPITAL: North of Superior Healthcare Group
LOCATION: Marathon

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA LYNN TOPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REBECCA LYNN TOPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016