THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
Box 37
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Department of Medicine - Division of Rheumatology
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137388400
Extension: 82883
Fax: 6137388228
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Clinician Investigator Program
Room FF38, Box 22
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899
Extension: 73896
Fax: 6137396885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1967 Riverside Dr
Box 37
The Ottawa Hospital Riverside Campus
Department of Medicine - Division of Rheumatology
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137388400
Extension: 82883
Fax: 6137388228
Address: 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Clinician Investigator Program
Room FF38, Box 22
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899
Extension: 73896
Fax: 6137396885

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOT PAUL HEPWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEPWORTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLIOT PAUL HEPWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEPWORTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016